Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 4434 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18477 Week
» 83431 Month
» 286095 Year
» 3312948 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5208 |
21/06/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25058 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
21/06/1963 to Toton (18A) |
Withdrawn |
03/02/1987 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 12/1988 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (Leicester) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
09/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
08/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
08/1974 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/06/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
05/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
09/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
08/1974 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/06/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5208 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
20/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To Scottish Region (91X) |
|
|
14/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
03/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
23/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
09/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25058 |
|
|
08/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
03/02/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25058 |
|
|
12/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|