Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1382 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19185 Week
» 72201 Month
» 191728 Year
» 3218581 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5229 |
29/09/1963 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25079 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/09/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
03/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
06/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1977 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/09/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
07/09/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
03/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
29/09/1963 |
Power Unit VA738 |
|
|
|
29/09/1963 |
Steam Heat Boiler 21185 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/09/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5229 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
02/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
07/09/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
08/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25079 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
28/08/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25079 |
|
|
07/01/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|