Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4397 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17803 Week
» 70819 Month
» 190346 Year
» 3217199 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5256 |
13/03/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25106 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
13/03/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1972 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
01/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/03/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
04/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
01/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/03/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5256 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
22/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
01/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
08/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
29/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
23/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
04/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25106 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
01/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
09/10/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25106 |
|
|
04/02/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|