|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/03/1962 | Swindon Works ('A' Shop) | Triangle: 1435, 3636, 4123/6, 4929, 5167, 5509/11/49, 6152/3/66, 6348, 7421, 7796, 8441, 8700/79, 9738. Works Yard: D3437, 1009/21/7, 3809/49, 4093, 4632, 4905/44, 5924, 6006, 6408, 6820, 6965/7, 7002/4/27/37, 7306, 8489/94, 8721/33/62/75, 9460, 9765. Weigh House: 5967. 'C' Shop: 8735, 9416. Dump: 1642, 2205/6/30/88, 4207, 5069, 5770, 7771/2, 8451, 8768, 9454/74, 9720. 'A' Shop: D600/2/3, D808, D1002-17, D2182-6, D3035, D3354/6/60/6/97, D3425, D4009, D6315/23/37, 8, 1013/5/9/28, 2516, 2859/73/6, 3440, 4003, 4286, 4920/50, 5026/43/56, 5990/1, 6012, 6821/7/39, 6906/13/36/50/71/3/93, 7001/3/6/13/26, 7226, 7320/37, 7918, 9400, 82040, 92222/37. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1926 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5261 Built at Swindon Works |
||
23/11/1935 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7226 | ||
14/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxley (OXY) | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Oxley (OXY) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) | ||
13/07/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
25/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) | ||
13/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Danygraig (87C) | ||
31/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) | ||
28/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) | ||
08/11/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdare (88J) | ||
13/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 7226 | ||
03/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |