Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4169 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17575 Week
» 70591 Month
» 190118 Year
» 3216971 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5263 |
14/04/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25113 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
14/04/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1972 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
03/1972 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/04/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
02/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/04/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5263 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
03/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
03/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25113 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
02/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
26/06/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25113 |
|
|
22/10/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|