Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 328 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18131 Week
» 71147 Month
» 190674 Year
» 3217527 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5265 |
22/04/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25115 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
22/04/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/04/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/04/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5265 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25115 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
02/10/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25115 |
|
|
12/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|