Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 798 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18601 Week
» 71617 Month
» 191144 Year
» 3217997 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5281 |
26/06/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25131 |
04/1974 |
|
Departmental (97/2) |
97202 |
01/10/1983 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
26/06/1964 to Toton (16A) |
Withdrawn |
01/01/1984 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys |
Cut Up |
06/1987 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (Leicester) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
26/06/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 04/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/06/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/06/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5281 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
01/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London (Midland) (D14) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
23/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
25/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25131 |
|
|
01/10/1983 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
01/10/1983 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 97202 |
|
|
01/01/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 97202 |
|
|
06/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|