Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 979 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2053 Week
» 27414 Month
» 260334 Year
» 1925710 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 5303 m/e 12/1916

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 205
Works Number 2675
To Service During 12/1916
Withdrawal Mon 28/05/1951
Service Life 34 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1916
215   Worcester on 01/01/1934 (Snapshot)
85   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 01/12/1945
KDR   Kidderminster 4w/e 20/04/1946
WOS   Worcester 4w/e 26/02/1949
     Withdrawn on 28/05/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KDR Kidderminster 4w/e 20/04/1946
ALLOC WOS Worcester 4w/e 26/02/1949
WDN   m/e 31/05/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1949 Swindon Works (entering Works) New Work June: Nos. 7021 Haverfordwest Castle LDR (7/6), 7022 Hereford Castle CDF (14/6), 7023 Penrice Castle CDF (23/6), *7024 Powis Castle (30/6); *1500 (22/6), 41501 (1/7). *Not allocated. Nos. 7021-24 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1500/1 are unlined black. No. 1500 has so far been tried on a variety of jobs, and it is possible that they all may go to Cardiff Docks. Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos. 1001/29, 1335/63, 1458, 2216, 2534/72, 2823/81/82/84/92, 2945, 3031/34, 3161/67, 3649, 3851, 4016/37/40/83/84, 4259, 4381, 4504/13/93, 4651, 4807/54/56 (for reconversion to coal-burning), 4961, 5008/28/52/53/82, 5151, 5303/32/61, 5510/57/58, 5760/80/92, 5800, 5910/35/40/66, 6007/20, 6105/08, 6314/35/44/70/79, 6409, 6739, 6814/21/26/63/70, 6904/20/68, 7016, 7239, 7700/10/24/28/35, 7803, 7900, 8762/98 and E1066. Condemned: 53, 1731, 2651/55, 3364, 9072. No. 7900 came in for rebalancing, while No. E1066 had a hot box. No. 2848 has been reconverted to coal-burning. No. 6000 was ex Works on 17/6 painted in the new blue and lined, with crest on the tender, while No. 6011 has also appeared in the same livery, but, as yet, has no crest on the tender. Nos. 4052/58 are ex Works painted green and lined, while further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1017/29, 6931/43 an 6936 (with the crest on the tender). Stock Shed: Nos. 4914, 5919, 6997-99 and 7902-04 have now been taken out of store and put into traffic, Nos. 4914, 6997/99 and 7902 have gone to BRD, No. 6998 to CDF and Nos. 7903/04 to PDN. SLS/194908

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1916 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5303
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2675
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Worcester (215)    
01/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85)    
20/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (KDR)    
26/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (WOS)    
28/05/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 5303    

prev prev