Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 267 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14310 Week
» 79264 Month
» 281928 Year
» 3308781 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5309 |
19/12/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
26009 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
19/12/1958 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/12/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
04/08/1961 |
Unknown |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
30/08/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
09/04/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Not known |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/12/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5309 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
04/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 26009 |
|
|
15/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
01/1977 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
27/01/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 26009 |
|
|
30/04/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|