Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 783 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14189 Week
» 67205 Month
» 186732 Year
» 3213585 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5333 |
10/07/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
26033 |
10/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
10/07/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/07/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
22/11/1963 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/07/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5333 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Haymarket (64B) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
25/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
02/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
06/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 26033 |
|
|
18/03/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 26033 |
|
|
03/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: at Thornton Yard |
|
|