Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1472 Today
» 1816 Yesterday
» 13903 Week
» 5295 Month
» 575224 Year
» 2975688 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5347 |
30/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
27001 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
30/06/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/06/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5347 Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company Allocated to Thornton Junction (62A) Livery applied: Green with white cab window surrounds and white waistline band on bodyside |
|
|
29/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
28/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
26/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 27001 |
|
|
08/07/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 27001 |
|
|