Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 30 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2105 Week
» 27466 Month
» 260386 Year
» 1925762 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 5355 m/e 08/1918

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 208
Works Number 2727
To Service During 08/1918
Withdrawal Thu 23/04/1959
Service Life 40 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1918
132   Swindon on 01/01/1934 (Snapshot)
86G   Pontypool Road 4w/e 29/11/1952
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 09/10/1954
85C   Hereford 8w/e 26/03/1955
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 13/07/1957
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 05/10/1957
     Withdrawn on 23/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 09/10/1954
ALLOC 85C Hereford 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 05/10/1957
WDN   m/e 30/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1953 Outside Steam Pipes fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during Nov. included: Nos. 905, 1001, 1010, 1413, 1450, 1713, 1799, 2327, 2722, 2781, 2838, 2864, 2868, 2927, 2941, 2979, 3186, 3383, 3817, 3834, 3852, 4039, 4056, 4058, 4073, 4088, 4089, 4919, 4925, 4969, 4979, 4995, 5008, 5042, 5070, 5078, 5336, 5355, 6115, 6136, 7311, W.D. 77291, 77393, 77508, 79278. Of these, 77291/393 and 79238 are ex Marston Sidings and repair in Belgium, and 77508/79278 are fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots during November have included Nos. 242, 905, 1713 an 2781. 'Star' Class No. 4054 EXE was ex Works on 8/11, having been lined out. W.D. No. 78542 GLO was ex Works on 12/11. This is another loco. fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Locos. which have been condemned during November are: Nos. 200, 207, 898, 2783 an 3007. SLS/194801
31/05/1959 Swindon Works (Scrapyard) Scrapyard1401/23/9/37/56/7/57, 2254, 2812/23/5/30/3, 4200/26/61, 4377, 4540/53/84, 5315/55/82/6/8/90, 5566, 5703/8/33/43, 5810, 6318/22/8/31/4/54, 6409/28, 6721/3/7/43, 7738. SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1918 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5355
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2727
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Swindon (132)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
08/1953 Modification Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (85C)    
13/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
23/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 5355    

prev prev