Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 5 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2080 Week
» 27441 Month
» 260361 Year
» 1925737 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 5394 m/e 10/1920

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 211
Works Number 2794
To Service During 10/1920
Withdrawal Wed 07/01/1959
Service Life 38 yrs, 3 mths , 8 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1920
85   Gloucester Horton Road on 01/01/1934 (Snapshot)
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 29/01/1955
     Withdrawn on 07/01/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 29/01/1955
WDN   m/e 31/01/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1920 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5394
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2794
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gloucester Horton Road (85)    
29/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
07/01/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 5394    

prev prev