Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1429 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19232 Week
» 72248 Month
» 191775 Year
» 3218628 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
5395 |
m/e |
10/1920 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
43xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
211 |
Works Number |
2795 |
To Service |
During 10/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 10/10/1955 |
Service Life |
35 yrs , 10 dys |
Total Mileage |
964,800 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
89C |
Machynlleth |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/10/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1931 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5395 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2795 |
|
|
11/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
|
|
01/01/1934 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Fishguard Goodwick (FGD) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) |
|
|
10/10/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5395 |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|