Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 247 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4224 Week
» 15461 Month
» 248381 Year
» 1913757 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 5396 m/e 11/1920

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 211
Works Number 2796
To Service During 11/1920
Withdrawal Mon 09/05/1960
Service Life 39 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1920
Sw Wks   Swindon Works on 01/01/1934 (Snapshot)
85A   Worcester 4w/e 06/10/1956
87H   Neyland 4w/e 02/11/1957
85A   Worcester 4w/e 22/02/1958
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 29/11/1958
85A   Worcester 4w/e 27/12/1958
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 21/03/1959
85A   Worcester 4w/e 16/05/1959
     Withdrawn on 09/05/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 87H Neyland 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 85A Worcester m/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 21/03/1959
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 16/05/1959
WDN   on 09/05/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1933 Outside Steam Pipes fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Swindon Works New Work March: Nos. *7901 Dodington Hall (23/3), *7902 Eaton Mascot Hall (31/3); 9675 MTHR 4/3), 9676 CYS (10/3), 9677 CED (17/3). *Not allocated. Locomotives entering Works 28/2/49 to 30/3/49: Nos. 1002/09, 1086 (re-numbered 1147), 1213 (re-numbered 9), 1415, 1758 SDN (condemned), 1894 NPT (condemned), 2011/12, 2226/40/92/99, 2724 CYS (condemned), 69, 2806/36/71/82/83, 2902/15/31/81/87, 3032/33/43, 3175, 3386, 3562 OXF (condemned), 3616/45/55/88, 3719/44/47, 3819/29, 3901/55 (both for re-conversion), 4000/03/07/13/49, 4213/37/60/70, 4527/35/38/58/65/69/98, 4624, 4703, 4806/51 (both for re-conversion), 4936/55, 5020/33/55/57/75/89/91/95, 5166, 5310/30/41/72/96, 5509/66, 5719/28/98, 5931/79/88, 6017/24/25/28, 6132/53, 6341/53, 6720/47, 6803/22/54, 6900/02/07/33/46/55/62/64, 7202/09, 7302, 7415, 7766/84, 8753, 9311, 9600, 9704/08 and Class '8' W.D. 77234 (re-numbered 90201). Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include:-Nos. 1002/28, 2947, 4990, 6917/24, while Nos. 4007/20 are painted green and also lined. Works' pilots recently have been:-Nos. *212/13/46 and **1900. *Condemned 7/48. **Condemned 4/48.
No. 3150 has been fitted with the curved front end frames and cylinders (outside steam pipes) of No. 3184 (condemned in 1948). The original frames of No. 3150 had a square front end and the cylinders had internal steam pipes. No. 2123 has been fitted with auto gear.
SLS/194905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1920 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5396
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2796
   
12/1933 Modification Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted    
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Swindon Works (Sw Wks)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
02/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Neyland (87H)    
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
27/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
21/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
16/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
09/05/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 5396    

prev prev