Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 4371 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17777 Week
» 70793 Month
» 190320 Year
» 3217173 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5502 |
16/12/1957 |
|
TOPS (31/0) |
31002 |
02/1974 |
|
Departmental (Dept) |
ADB968014 |
05/01/1980 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
16/12/1957 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/12/1957 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1977 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
0000 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
0000 |
Severe |
|
Mechanical seizures or failures |
Electrical insulation |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/12/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5502 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
14/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31002 |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
01/01/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31002 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
05/01/1980 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to ADB968014 |
|
|
05/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|