Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 32 Online
» 3926 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17969 Week
» 82923 Month
» 285587 Year
» 3312440 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5506 |
13/03/1958 |
|
TOPS (31/0) |
31006 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
13/03/1958 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
25/05/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
28/01/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
28/01/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/03/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
28/01/1977 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
10/06/1961 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
12/11/1961 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/03/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5506 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31006 |
|
|
28/01/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
28/01/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
05/01/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31006 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
12/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|