Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 13 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2088 Week
» 27449 Month
» 260369 Year
» 1925745 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5518 m/e 11/1927

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 4575
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 249
To Service During 11/1927
Withdrawal Wed 06/05/1964
Service Life 36 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1927
GLO   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 28/01/1950
85D   Kidderminster 3w/e 19/05/1951
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 09/10/1954
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 11/08/1956
83B   Taunton 4w/e 05/11/1960
83E   St Blazey 4w/e 03/12/1960
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 28/09/1963
     Withdrawn on 06/05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GLO Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 28/01/1950
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 19/05/1951
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 09/10/1954
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 11/08/1956
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 05/11/1960
ALLOC 83E St Blazey 4w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 29/09/1963
WDN   on 06/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1927 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5518
Built at Swindon Works
   
28/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (GLO)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (83E)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
06/05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5518    
07/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev