Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 863 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14269 Week
» 67285 Month
» 186812 Year
» 3213665 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5522 |
12/03/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31104 |
|
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31418 |
12/11/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
30 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
A1A-A1A |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
To Service |
12/03/1959 to Stratford (30A) |
Withdrawn |
06/10/1995 |
Time in Service |
36 yrs, 6 mths , 24 dys |
Information |
Disc Indicators |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
12/03/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
18/11/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
11/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1973 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
01/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
15/10/1987 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/03/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
11/1973 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
01/1974 |
xei |
Dual brakes, Dual heat, boiler isolated |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
15/10/1987 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
26/10/1962 |
Severe |
|
Not known |
Not known |
|
|
03/10/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/03/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5522 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
18/11/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/04/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 31104 but not taken up |
|
|
18/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CD) |
|
|
11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
12/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31418 |
|
|
01/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
15/10/1987 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/10/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31418 |
|
|