Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 2850 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16256 Week
» 69272 Month
» 188799 Year
» 3215652 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5528 |
30/04/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31110 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
30/04/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/03/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/03/1969 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
11/04/1970 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
06/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/04/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
05/03/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/04/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
04/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/1982 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
20/02/1961 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/04/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5528 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
31/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
23/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41f) |
|
|
11/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
05/03/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/03/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
11/04/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31110 |
|
|
04/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
09/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
06/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
31/05/2006 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31110 |
|
|
04/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|