Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1418 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19221 Week
» 72237 Month
» 191764 Year
» 3218617 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5538 |
02/07/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31120 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
02/07/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
27/02/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/07/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
27/02/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 11/1975 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/07/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5538 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
23/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41f) |
|
|
05/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
12/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
22/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
27/02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
11/09/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31120 |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
29/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
27/09/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31120 |
|
|
06/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|