Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1360 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19163 Week
» 72179 Month
» 191706 Year
» 3218559 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5547 |
27/08/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31129 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31461 |
20/01/1985 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
27/08/1959 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
02/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/08/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 03/1980 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
0000 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/08/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5547 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
12/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
23/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
20/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
28/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
27/03/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31129 |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
20/01/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31461 |
|
|