Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 191 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14234 Week
» 79188 Month
» 281852 Year
» 3308705 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5579 |
07/01/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31161 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31400 |
13/05/1988 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
07/01/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
25/05/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/01/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/01/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5579 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
15/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31161 |
|
|
09/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
13/05/1988 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31400 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
01/07/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31400 |
|
|
08/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|