21/01/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5583 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
27/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
27/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
20/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41f) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
22/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
26/10/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/04/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
11/12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31165 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
08/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
09/1998 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Crewe Works |
|
|
21/01/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31165 |
|
|