11/02/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5588 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
04/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
20/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
12/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
14/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
18/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
18/11/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
17/11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
17/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31170 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
08/01/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31170 |
|
|
12/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|