Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1405 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19208 Week
» 72224 Month
» 191751 Year
» 3218604 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5600 |
24/03/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31179 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31435 |
21/02/1984 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
30 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
A1A-A1A |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
To Service |
24/03/1960 to Hornsey (34B) |
Withdrawn |
01/11/1995 |
Time in Service |
35 yrs, 7 mths , 8 dys |
Information |
4-digit route indicators |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
24/03/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
02/1984 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1984 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/03/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
02/1984 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
01/12/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Not known |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5600 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
03/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31179 |
|
|
02/1984 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1984 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
21/02/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31435 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
01/11/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31435 |
|
|