Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 832 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6232 Week
» 24284 Month
» 257204 Year
» 1922580 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5602 m/e 12/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 228
To Service During 12/1924
Withdrawal Mon 07/09/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 9 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1924
86G   Pontypool Road m/e 31/10/1951
86H   Aberbeeg 3w/e 17/05/1952
86C   Cardiff Canton 4w/e 27/03/1954
87F   Llanelly 4w/e 13/08/1960
87D   Swansea East Dock 4w/e 27/07/1963
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/11/1963
88B   Radyr 4w/e 20/07/1964
     Withdrawn on 07/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road m/e 31/10/1951
ALLOC 86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 13/08/1960
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 27/07/1963
ALLOC 88DRHYM   4w/e 30/11/1963
ALLOC 88B Radyr 3w/e 20/07/1964
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/10/1962 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works 1628/60, 2841/62, 3217, 3608/58, 3709/15/51/60/78, 4147, 4910/51, 5070, 5245, 5602, 6141, 6644/63/79, 6816, 6982, 7209, 8498, 9411/53, 9608/10/5/40/82. Ex-Works on shed: 9404/15; ex-Works on Oxley MPD; 4697, 7739. 'Kings' at Stafford Road minus numbers and nameplates: 6001/2/7/12/4/5/7/22. SLS/196211
11/10/1964 Swindon Works (C shop area) Erecting shop: D602, D806/15/7/32/7/43/9, D1006/16/24/32/58/60/72, D3025/32/190/807/20/966, D6335/52/6, D7017/46/63, 2210, 6823/7, 6951, 7924/9, 42945/75, 43001/112/20/37, 73034, 92223, D9515/6 Painted, D9517-20 Cabs, D9521-7 Motors, D9528/9 Frames; PWM653; C shop area: NCB 67 (ex-TVR) and 6000 still awaiting movement to Stratford; 2818, 3748, 4626, 5264, 5602, 6010, 6824/73, 8401/18, 9484, 9752, 43003, 60809/12/56/87/916/22/32/41/5, 78009; Outside Erecting shop: 7803, 43012; Turntable area: D830/60, D1010/20, D3437, D7022/7/64, 4659, 8405/9, 9425, 9454, 42954; Stored Stock shed: 1010/2/4, 3702, 4569, 4916, 5963/75, 6804, 73012 SLS/196411
20/12/1964 Swindon Works (Dump: ble area) 'A' Shop: D9525-9541, D603, D803/7/8/14, D820/7, D830, D853/9, D860/3/6, D1000/57, D3039, D3196, D3743/5/61, D3808/15, D3822, D6307/26/30/8/53, D7005/14, L95, 42975, 43003/12/112. Weigh House: D1037. 'C' Shop: 5257, 8401 remains. Triangle: 7023 in steam. Turntable area: 4659, 7782, 8405/9, 9425/57, 42945, 92223. Dump: 2818, 3685, 4626, 5264, 5602, 6010, 6824, 6873, 7327, 8418, 9484, 9752, 78009. SLS/196502

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1924 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5602
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H)    
27/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
20/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
07/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5602    
01/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev