Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 4306 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17712 Week
» 70728 Month
» 190255 Year
» 3217108 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5603 |
31/03/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31182 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31437 |
16/03/1984 |
|
TOPS (31/5) |
31537 |
31/12/1989 |
|
TOPS (31/4 (2)) |
31437 |
05/02/2001 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
31/03/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
02/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 01/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/03/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
11/03/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5603 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
25/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
27/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
04/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
01/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
06/11/1971 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
20/11/1971 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
04/03/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
02/06/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MC) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31182 |
|
|
16/03/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31437 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
31/12/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31537 |
|
|
05/02/2001 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31437 |
|
|