Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 774 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6174 Week
» 24226 Month
» 257146 Year
» 1922522 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5605 m/e 01/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 228
To Service During 01/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/05/1966
Service Life 41 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1925
NPT   Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 21/05/1949
RHY   Rhymney 4w/e 31/12/1949
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
88E   Abercynon 7w/e 22/06/1964
88D   Rhymney w/e 08/11/1964
2A   Tyseley on 25/04/1965
6C   Croes Newydd w/e 11/12/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 21/05/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NPTG Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC RHY Rhymney 4w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 3w/e 29/06/1964
ALLOC 88D Rhymney 3w/e 02/11/1964
ALLOC 2A Tyseley 4w/e 08/05/1965
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 5w/e 08/01/1966
WDN   w/e 21/05/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1925 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5605
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT )    
31/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Rhymney (RHY)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Rhymney (88D)    
25/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
11/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
21/05/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 5605    
12/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev