Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 216 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3248 Week
» 21300 Month
» 254220 Year
» 1919596 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5609 m/e 02/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 228
To Service During 02/1925
Withdrawal Mon 19/10/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 8 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1925
87D   Swansea East Dock 4w/e 05/11/1960
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/12/1963
     Withdrawn on 19/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 05/11/1960
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/12/1963
WDN   w/e 19/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1925 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5609
Built at Swindon Works
   
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
19/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5609    
01/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev