Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 239 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3271 Week
» 21323 Month
» 254243 Year
» 1919619 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5610 m/e 02/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 228
To Service During 02/1925
Withdrawal Mon 16/12/1963
Service Life 38 yrs, 10 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1925
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 04/12/1954
88F   Treherbert 4w/e 16/07/1955
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/01/1960
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
     Withdrawn on 16/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 04/12/1954
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
WDN   4w/e 31/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1925 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5610
Built at Swindon Works
   
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
16/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5610    
03/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev