Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 836 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6236 Week
» 24288 Month
» 257208 Year
» 1922584 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5615 m/e 03/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 228
To Service During 03/1925
Withdrawal Tue 02/07/1963
Service Life 38 yrs, 4 mths , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1925
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 04/12/1954
88A   Radyr 4w/e 04/10/1958
88C   Barry 4w/e 29/11/1958
88A   Radyr 4w/e 18/04/1959
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 09/09/1961
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 01/06/1963
     Withdrawn on 02/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 04/12/1954
ALLOC 88A Radyr 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 88A Radyr 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 09/09/1961
TOSTORE   4w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 01/06/1963
WDN   4w/e 29/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1925 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5615
Built at Swindon Works
   
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
18/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
09/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
01/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
02/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5615    
01/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev