19/05/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5617 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
05/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
06/06/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
02/07/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
08/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
04/11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
04/11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
24/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31193 |
|
|
04/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
07/10/1983 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31426 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
05/10/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31526 |
|
|
01/05/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31526 |
|
|
05/02/2001 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31426 |
|
|
11/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|