Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 211 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3243 Week
» 21295 Month
» 254215 Year
» 1919591 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5617 m/e 03/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 228
To Service During 03/1925
Withdrawal Sat 01/09/1962
Service Life 37 yrs, 6 mths , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1963 at Cohens (Morriston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1925
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/06/1950
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 29/12/1951
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 31/01/1952
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 3w/e 17/05/1952
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 14/06/1952
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 6w/e 30/06/1952
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 30/01/1954
     Withdrawn on 01/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/06/1950
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 5w/e 30/01/1954
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1962 Withdrawn GWR engines It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1925 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5617
Built at Swindon Works
   
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
31/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
30/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
01/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5617    
08/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev