Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 776 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6176 Week
» 24228 Month
» 257148 Year
» 1922524 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5618 m/e 03/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 228
To Service During 03/1925
Withdrawal Fri 19/03/1965
Service Life 40 yrs , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1925
88A   Radyr 4w/e 03/10/1959
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 13/08/1960
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
     Withdrawn on 19/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88A Radyr 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 13/08/1960
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
WDN   5w/e 12/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/10/1961 Caerphilly Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 1420/71, 1506, 1651/68 3702, 4242/65/79/98, 5232, 5618, 6115/45, 6684, 8464/9/86, 9420/57, 9671, 9710, 92221/9. Works Yard: 3682, 3797, 4690, 6108, 9489, 9639, 92238. SLS/196112

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1925 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5618
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
19/03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 5618    
04/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev