Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 1 Online
» 302 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18105 Week
» 71121 Month
» 190648 Year
» 3217501 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5620 |
02/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31196 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
02/06/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
01/1968 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1965 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
26/09/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/06/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
26/09/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
06/06/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
19/10/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5620 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
24/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
08/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
01/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
26/09/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31196 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
25/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
26/02/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31196 |
|
|
02/2001 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Stratford MPD |
|
|