Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 123 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17926 Week
» 70942 Month
» 190469 Year
» 3217322 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5621 |
02/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31197 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31423 |
01/1975 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
02/06/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
01/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1975 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
05/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1979 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/06/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
01/1975 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
02/1975 |
xei |
Dual brakes, Dual heat, boiler isolated |
|
|
|
05/1976 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1979 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
cX |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5621 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
03/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31197 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
19/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
01/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
01/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31423 |
|
|
02/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
09/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
01/09/1996 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31423 |
|
|
09/2009 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|