Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 756 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6156 Week
» 24208 Month
» 257128 Year
» 1922504 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5621 m/e 06/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 228
To Service During 06/1925
Withdrawal Thu 03/06/1965
Service Life 40 yrs , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1925
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/11/1963
     Withdrawn on 03/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/11/1963
TOSTORE   5w/e 12/04/1965
WDN   on 03/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1925 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5621
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
03/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 5621    
10/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev