Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 718 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6118 Week
» 24170 Month
» 257090 Year
» 1922466 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5622 m/e 06/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 228
To Service During 06/1925
Withdrawal Thu 06/06/1963
Service Life 38 yrs , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1925
THT   Treherbert m/e 30/06/1948
BRY   Barry on 14/10/1948
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 26/01/1957
88C   Barry 4w/e 25/01/1958
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 18/04/1959
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
     Withdrawn on 06/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BRY Barry 4w/e 25/01/1947
ALLOC THT Treherbert m/e 30/06/1948
ALLOC BRY Barry on 14/10/1948
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
WDN   4w/e 01/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1925 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5622
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (THT)    
14/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (BRY)    
26/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
18/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
06/06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5622    
12/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev