Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 243 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3275 Week
» 21327 Month
» 254247 Year
» 1919623 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5623 m/e 06/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 228
To Service During 06/1925
Withdrawal Fri 14/02/1964
Service Life 38 yrs, 8 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1925
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 09/09/1950
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/09/1950
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 17/10/1950
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 31/10/1950
87D   Swansea East Dock 4w/e 05/11/1960
88B   Radyr 4w/e 28/12/1963
     Withdrawn on 14/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 09/09/1950
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 17/10/1950
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 05/11/1960
ALLOC 88B Radyr 4w/e 31/12/1963
WDN   on 14/02/1964
WDN   5w/e 30/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1925 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5623
Built at Swindon Works
   
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
30/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
17/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
31/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
14/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5623    
05/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev