Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1142 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24773 Week
» 89727 Month
» 292391 Year
» 3319244 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5625 |
16/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31201 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
16/06/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
17/02/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
|
|
03/1980 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/06/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
17/02/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/1980 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5625 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 225 Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
05/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
17/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31201 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
24/03/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31201 |
|
|
05/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|