Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1871 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19674 Week
» 72690 Month
» 192217 Year
» 3219070 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5628 |
30/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31204 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31440 |
18/04/1984 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
30/06/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
04/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/06/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
04/1982 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5628 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 228 Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
10/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31204 |
|
|
04/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
18/04/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31440 |
|
|
01/03/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31440 |
|
|
03/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|