Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 25 Today
» 892 Yesterday
» 1935 Week
» 2874 Month
» 206364 Year
» 1871740 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5629 30/06/1960  
TOPS (31/1) 31205 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/230/06/1960
31/113/07/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 229
To Service 30/06/1960 to Norwich Thorpe (32A)
Withdrawn 18/02/2000
Time in Service 39 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys
Cut Up 07/2002
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32A Norwich Thorpe (New) on 30/06/1960
30A Stratford w/e 17/09/1960
31B March w/e 26/11/1960
   Withdrawn on 18/02/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
13/07/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31        
09/1975   Dual Braked        


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
30/06/1960 To Service To service as British Railways Number 5629
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 229
Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)
   
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
13/07/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31205    
09/1975 Modification Modification: Dual Braked    
18/02/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31205    
07/2002 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev