Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1440 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19243 Week
» 72259 Month
» 191786 Year
» 3218639 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5629 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
228 |
To Service |
During 08/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 14/05/1964 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 9 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
81E |
Didcot |
4w/e |
26/12/1953 |
ALLOC |
87H |
Neyland |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
ALLOC |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
ALLOC |
86F |
Tondu |
4w/e |
02/11/1957 |
ALLOC |
88E |
Abercynon |
4w/e |
12/01/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/05/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5629 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Duffryn Yard (DYD) |
|
|
26/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Didcot (81E) |
|
|
13/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neyland (87H) |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
02/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tondu (86F) |
|
|
12/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
14/05/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5629 |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|