Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2010 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15416 Week
» 68432 Month
» 187959 Year
» 3214812 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5630 |
07/07/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31206 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
30 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
A1A-A1A |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
Works Number |
230 |
To Service |
07/07/1960 to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
Withdrawn |
30/11/2006 |
Time in Service |
46 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys |
Information |
4-digit route indicators |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
07/07/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
02/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
07/08/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/07/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
07/08/1975 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/07/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5630 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 230 Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
01/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
08/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
23/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
06/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31206 |
|
|
07/08/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/11/2006 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31206 |
|
|