Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 187 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3219 Week
» 21271 Month
» 254191 Year
» 1919567 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5630 m/e 08/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 228
To Service During 08/1925
Withdrawal Wed 05/12/1962
Service Life 37 yrs, 4 mths , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1925
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 17/10/1950
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 31/10/1950
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 25/01/1958
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/05/1958
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 28/01/1961
     Withdrawn on 05/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 17/10/1950
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 28/01/1961
WDN   on 05/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/04/1948 Barry Works On 2/4 the following were observed in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 344, 3707/14/75, 5608/19/60, 6669, 6754 an 9789, while out-side were:-Nos. 414, 1993, 5630, 6680, 6700 an 8748. SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1925 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5630
Built at Swindon Works
   
17/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
31/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
05/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5630    
08/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev