Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 220 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3252 Week
» 21304 Month
» 254224 Year
» 1919600 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5632 m/e 09/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 228
To Service During 09/1925
Withdrawal Mon 07/09/1964
Service Life 39 yrs , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1925
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1956
88F   Treherbert 4w/e 25/02/1956
88F   Treherbert 4w/e 28/01/1961
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 06/04/1963
     Withdrawn on 07/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1956
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 28/01/1961
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 06/04/1963
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1925 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5632
Built at Swindon Works
   
28/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
25/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
06/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
07/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5632    
12/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev