Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 193 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3225 Week
» 21277 Month
» 254197 Year
» 1919573 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5635 m/e 09/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 228
To Service During 09/1925
Withdrawal Thu 14/05/1964
Service Life 38 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1925
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 09/09/1950
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/09/1950
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/10/1950
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/10/1950
88B   Radyr 4w/e 28/01/1961
     Withdrawn on 14/05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 09/09/1950
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/10/1950
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 28/01/1961
WDN   on 14/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/04/1948 Caerphilly Works On 2/4 the following locomotives were noted in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 64, 72, 270, 320/21, 390, 3103/89, 3712, 4134, 4256/63/93/98, 4404, 5114, 5223, 5635/58/68/80, 6661 an 8796, while outside were observed Nos. 190, 3178, 4238/52, 5219, 5549 an 5649. SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1925 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5635
Built at Swindon Works
   
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
30/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
17/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
31/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
14/05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5635    
07/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev