Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 244 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3276 Week
» 21328 Month
» 254248 Year
» 1919624 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5636 m/e 09/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 228
To Service During 09/1925
Withdrawal Mon 21/05/1962
Service Life 36 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1925
CHYS   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 21/05/1949
88F   Treherbert 4w/e 24/03/1956
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 21/04/1956
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 24/01/1959
88C   Barry 4w/e 26/03/1960
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
     Withdrawn on 21/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 24/03/1956
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 21/04/1956
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil m/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 26/03/1960
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
WDN   on 19/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/05/1962 South Wales 5636/9/82 an 6687 withdrawn 19th May were noted as follows-on 20th May, 5682 was at rear of Abercynon shed marked 'not to be moved' and 5636/9 and 6687 were noted at Radyr waiting CME's decision. By 15th June, Canton's original Kings had dwindled to two-6010/28; (6003/4/24 are in store and 6023 stopped for factory while 6018/9 have been transferred to 81A). The 8-55 a.m. and 7-20 p.m. Cardiff-Salop are usually King-hauled. All Canton's Castles are regularly employed. SLS/196207
31/05/1962 First G.W.R. Collett 5600 Class condemned The first inroads were made to the Collett 5600 Class 0-6-2T locos. when 5636 of Merthyr (88D), 5639 of Barry (88C), 5682 of Abercynon (88E) and 6687 of Aberdare (88J) were withdrawn from service during May. SLS/196207

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1925 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5636
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (CHYS)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
21/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5636    
09/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev