Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 962 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18765 Week
» 71781 Month
» 191308 Year
» 3218161 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5639 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
228 |
To Service |
During 09/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/05/1962 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/05/1962 |
South Wales |
5636/9/82 an 6687 withdrawn 19th May were noted as follows-on 20th May, 5682 was at rear of Abercynon shed marked 'not to be moved' and 5636/9 and 6687 were noted at Radyr waiting CME's decision. By 15th June, Canton's original Kings had dwindled to two-6010/28; (6003/4/24 are in store and 6023 stopped for factory while 6018/9 have been transferred to 81A). The 8-55 a.m. and 7-20 p.m. Cardiff-Salop are usually King-hauled. All Canton's Castles are regularly employed. |
SLS/196207 |
31/05/1962 |
First G.W.R. Collett 5600 Class condemned |
The first inroads were made to the Collett 5600 Class 0-6-2T locos. when 5636 of Merthyr (88D), 5639 of Barry (88C), 5682 of Abercynon (88E) and 6687 of Aberdare (88J) were withdrawn from service during May. |
SLS/196207 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5639 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Duffryn Yard (DYD) |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
31/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neyland (87H) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Didcot (81E) |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
21/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5639 |
|
|
09/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|